CHRYSALIS (OAKMERE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?The charity?s objects are, for the public benefit: 1. The advancement of Christianity though such exclusively charitable means as the trustee determine; 2. To advance education, relieve poverty and sickness and promote good health of people within Oakmere, Potters Bar and the surrounding areas within a Christian ethos.?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROGER MALCOLM TAYLOR | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Judy Huttlestone | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Huttlestone | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILLIP JOHN COFFIN | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNY TAYLOR | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.98k | £4.61k | £1.01k | £22 | £52 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.06k | £10.20k | £874 | £150 | £826 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY THOUGH SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEE DETERMINE; 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITHIN OAKMERE, POTTERS BAR AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 STAMFORD CLOSE
POTTERS BAR
EN6 5NW
- Phone:
- 07712104071
- Email:
- rmt.chrysalis@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window