BOLTON NEURO VOICES

Charity number: 1178772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN FLINT Trustee 05 January 2018 None on record
MARIE OXTOBY Chair 05 January 2018 None on record
MOYRA EVA LEWIS Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
Neil Germaine Trustee 04 November 2020 None on record
MOYRA MCDERMOTT Trustee 05 January 2018 None on record
Graham BRUSHETT Trustee 04 March 2019 None on record
ANNETTE MARIE STUART Trustee 05 January 2018 None on record
Christine Lee Trustee 04 November 2020 None on record
Marie BOARDMAN Trustee 05 June 2019 None on record