DEVON AND CORNWALL PEELERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1179980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVEN IAIN GARDNER Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
Dr REBECCA HOLLY MITCHELL Trustee 05 June 2018 None on record
Kylie Joyce Trustee 05 November 2019 None on record
JANICE ANN ADAM Chair 09 August 2018 None on record
TIA LOUISE MATT Trustee 05 May 2018 None on record
Dr MARY KATE SYNGE PHD Trustee 19 August 2018 None on record
ANDY BERRY Trustee 09 March 2018 None on record