SELSTON PARISH VILLAGE HALLS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Halls provide spaces for the inhabitants of Selston Parish to take part in physical exercise, training, meetings, lectures, classes and other such forms of recreation having the object of improving the conditions of life for said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £47,410 from 12 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FRANKLIN-PRYCE | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Justice | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JACKSON | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Dennis Wilson | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE WILSON | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Roe | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Slater | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Gregory | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Holmes | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Whyte | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Limb | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Wright | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE PAGE | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JACKSON | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.95k | £100.52k | £107.19k | £109.47k | £119.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.85k | £56.55k | £73.85k | £182.73k | £154.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.45k | £75.55k | £57.78k | N/A | £47.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN 3 VILLAGE HALLS; JACKSDALE COMMUNITY CENTRE, UNDERWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE AND SELSTON PARISH HALL AND RECREATION GROUND AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SELSTON ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SELSTON PARISH COUNCIL
PARISH HALL
MANSFIELD ROAD
SELSTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 6EE
- Phone:
- 01773812012
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window