ST PETER'S PRESCHOOL ARDINGLY

Charity number: 1178138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 April 2021 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 April 2021 280 days late Download