Accounts and annual returns THE ARCHIE CRUICKSHANK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178889
Charity reporting is overdue by 237 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 January 2022 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 January 2022 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2022 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 January 2022 358 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window