Trustees CHRIST CHURCH PADGATE PCC

Charity number: 1178871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev NEIL GRAHAM SHAW Chair 08 March 2014
None on record
Rita Kelly Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
LAURA LAWRENCE Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Hilary Brown Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
John Barrie Crabtree Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Janet Blaydon Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Sandra Bryers Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
John Baguley Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Cath Baguley Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Edward Collinson Trustee 15 March 2020
WARRINGTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: 4 days late
JILL PERFECT Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Louise Helen Elizabeth Appleby Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
DEBRA JACQUES Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
ALAN KEMP Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
SUSAN JENNIFER ROBINSON Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
DAVID MICHAEL RODNEY PERFECT Trustee 01 April 2014
WARRINGTON MUSICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
ALAN MARKHAM CLAYTON Trustee 06 April 2011
None on record