Accounts and annual returns ENTERPRISE ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1180934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 March 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required