FRIENDS OF ST. PETER'S BYWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of St. Peter's Church Bywell pay a small membership fee to join, with all receipts being held to help towards maintenance costs of the Grade 1 listed historic building. In addition, the trustees organise and arrange a small number of fund raising events each year (usually three). All proceeds from the events go to this charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Northumberland
Governance
- 16 March 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RALPH MARRISON B.SC. | Chair | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rita Anne Marrison | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE AUGUSTUS TIMOTHY ASTBURY | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALEXANDER DAVIDSON | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLARE FELICITY DALTRY | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.85k | £3.09k | £2.76k | £2.68k | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £300 | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
TO HELP CONSERVE, MAINTAIN, AND IMPROVE THE FABRIC, FURNISHINGS AND FITTINGS OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH, BYWELL AND TO 1) SUPPORT THE UPKEEP OF THE BUILDING; 2) FOSTER PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE BUILDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROOMLEY GRANGE LODGE
BROOMLEY
STOCKSFIELD
NE43 7RX
- Phone:
- 07743296200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window