ST ISHMAEL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 511797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 April 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 09 April 2021 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required