ST ISHMAEL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 511797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £424 £383 £10 £10 £0
Total expenditure £220 £215 £271 £378 £88
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A