DAR AL KHIDMAT FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to improve lives of the less fortunate who are living in rural area of Pakistan. We aim to provide housing, education, training opportunity , maintain and improve roads and accessibility to main routes and also provide public amenities. The aim is to improve living conditions and try and benefit the whole village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 21 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD ANWAR | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SOBIA ARIF | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARIF MOHAMMED | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31k | £6.59k | £10.71k | £11.65k | £8.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £5.23k | £7.48k | £12.96k | £2.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 71 days late | |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN PAKISTAN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE VILLAGE OF DANNA AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT: (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: (D) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING: (E) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: (F) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
IN PAKISTAN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE VILLAGE OF DANNA AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 WESTBOURNE STREET
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS18 3EN
- Phone:
- 07539311900
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window