Trustees THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN WYTHENSHAWE

Charity number: 1181489
Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pauline Nolan Trustee 03 August 2022
None on record
Robert Philip Alexander Chilton Trustee 20 July 2021
SALE CIVIC SOCIETY
Overdue by 593 days
Rev Ian Christopher Fellows Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Rita Woodhead Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Susan Ransley Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Norma Spencer Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
KATHLEEN TERESA FORDEN Trustee 19 July 2018
None on record
PATRICIA HIGSON Trustee 19 July 2018
None on record