Accounts and annual returns OVERPOOL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511818
Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 June 2019 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 June 2019 509 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required