Financial history OVERPOOL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511818
Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.98k £6.74k £4.19k £4.93k £5.95k
Total expenditure £4.98k £6.74k £4.19k £4.93k £4.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A