Accounts and annual returns Impact Christian Centre UK

Charity number: 1177977
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 June 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 13 June 2022 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 September 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 September 2021 100 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 October 2020 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 October 2020 152 days late Download Open in new window