Alex Ferry Foundation

Charity number: 1179847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR TIM GRIFFITHS Trustee 17 October 2018 None on record
Bob Holmes Trustee 17 October 2018 None on record
Duncan McPhee Trustee 17 October 2018 None on record
John Rowse Chair 11 January 2018 None on record
Colin Stevenson Trustee 17 October 2018 None on record
Diana Margaret Holland Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Ross Murdoch Trustee 17 September 2018 None on record
Aladair McDiarmid Trustee 17 September 2018 None on record
John David Emerson Trustee 11 November 2020
THE DAVID FAMILY FOUNDATION Received: 37 days late
ACTION WITH COMMUNITIES IN RURAL ENGLAND (ACRE) Received: On time
LONGLEIGH FOUNDATION Received: On time
Steve Hibbert Trustee 17 October 2018 None on record
Hugh Scullion Trustee 11 January 2018 None on record