Accounts and annual returns 42ASHBOURNE LIMITED
Charity number: 1177314

Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 39 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 39 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 06 February 2020 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window