Accounts and annual returns NEWLANDS PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1177638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 12 April 2023 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 November 2021 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 November 2021 536 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required