JIGGENS MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 1179584
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 March 2020 39 days late Download