Accounts and annual returns AL HAFIDHOON ACADEMY

Charity number: 1178844
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 August 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 August 2021 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 July 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 July 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window