Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, THE LACE MARKET, NOTTINGHAM
Charity number: 1177652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philippa Ann Scott | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Richardson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Jean Richardson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Sonia Walpole | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James TRIGGS | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Lindstrom | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward William Mills | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Elizabeth Fisken | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giacomo Roberto Persico | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Grant Robert Walton | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hancox | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JANE WIEDEMANN | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Jean Hammonds | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER DAVID BARTLETT | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN EDWARD STORK | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.