THREE COUNTIES AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 511868
Charity reporting is up to date (126 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER HEAD Trustee 01 December 2016
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE SOCIETY Received: On time
MRS LINDSEY VICTORIA CRADDOCK Trustee None on record
James Hawkins Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
PATRICK STEPHEN DOWNES Trustee None on record
DAVID THOMAS OWENS Trustee
THE PEMBRIDGE AMENITY TRUST Received: On time
DAVID SMART Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
ADRIAN HOPE Trustee 01 December 2014 None on record
MICHAEL DAVID WARNER Trustee None on record
Peter Dowle Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
Clive Roads FLAA Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record