MEGAN HURLEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide short term help & support to self-employed families unable to attend work due to the sudden and unexpected loss of a child. The charity may also provide support to other good causes that will benefit children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL LEE HURLEY | Chair | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE OWENS | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE HURLEY | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
GAY TARA ANDERSON | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.72k | £23.98k | £26.32k | £31.86k | £50.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.79k | £16.28k | £9.81k | £11.30k | £15.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 November 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 November 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG SELF EMPLOYED PEOPLE RESIDING IN LIVERPOOL, KNOWSLEY, WIRRAL, HALTON, SEFTON, ST HELENS, CHESHIRE WEST AND CHESTER WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE UNEXPECTED SUDDEN TRAGIC LOSS OF A CHILD BY THE AWARD OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO COVER LOSS OF INCOME DUE TO INABILITY TO WORK AS A RESULT OF BEREAVEMENT. 2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEGAN HURLEY FOUNDATION
16A MACKETS LANE
LIVERPOOL
L25 0LQ
- Phone:
- 07879654768
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window