Accounts and annual returns PURPLE PATCH ARTS

Charity number: 1178031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 12 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window