PRO TERRA SANCTA UK

Charity number: 1178965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 04 March 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 04 March 2020 4 days late Download