Accounts and annual returns LEOPOLD COMMUNITY CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (LCCA)

Charity number: 1182984
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 04 April 2022 05 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 20 April 2023 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 05 February 2023 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 19 April 2023 439 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 11 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window