Accounts and annual returns ACTIVE OXFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1179040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window