Accounts and annual returns TLAP CIA

Charity number: 1177859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 December 2020 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required