TREASURE CHEST

Charity number: 1178219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide before & after school clubs as well as nursery facilities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £265,998
Total expenditure: £291,788

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wrexham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 2018: CIO registration
  • 20 February 2020: Funds received from 1085451 PARK SCHOOLS LLAY OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SCOT OWEN Chair 01 September 2018
ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN WREXHAM
Received: On time
Rebecca Lynn Billington Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
LOUISE JONES Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
JOANNE LOUISE MARTIN Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £232.73k £302.53k £309.78k £337.07k £266.00k
Total expenditure £231.90k £287.86k £287.91k £344.44k £291.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £184.15k £185.43k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.62k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 January 2025 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 January 2025 194 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 October 2023 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 17 October 2023 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 December 2022 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 December 2022 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 June 2022 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 June 2022 342 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Park C P School Llay
School Road
Llay
WREXHAM
LL12 0TR
Phone:
01978859100
Website:

No information available