Accounts and annual returns AASHA ENGLAND

Charity number: 1179464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 March 2021 412 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 March 2021 412 days late Download Open in new window