Accounts and annual returns GENESIS PHILANTHROPY GROUP

Charity number: 1180696
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 277 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 277 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window