WINDMILL MISSIONAL COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a contemporary expression of Christian Church- we aim to create an informal space in modern day life where people can ENCOUNTER GOD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 May 2018: CIO registration
- SUNDAY PRAISE BOTTESFORD (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jodie Lorraine Baston | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wing Sze - Alisa Chan | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anita Bradley | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Marsh | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Erica Berrisford | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Brooks | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHMOND TOPPS | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURA CLARE MARSH | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.95k | £4.39k | £3.70k | £3.65k | £3.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £4.19k | £3.23k | £4.62k | £3.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS A FRESH EXPRESSION OF CHURCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MISSION AND VALUES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Fleming Avenue
Bottesford
Nottingham
Leicestershire
NG13 0ED
- Phone:
- 000000000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window