Accounts and annual returns ACTS OF KINDNESS COMMUNITY (SOLENT)

Charity number: 1180072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 December 2020 04 April 2022 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2020 04 April 2022 177 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window