Financial history WROSE ADVENTURERS CIO

Charity number: 1178041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.18k £6.19k £3.35k £4.35k £15.90k
Total expenditure £10.81k £4.76k £7.70k £9.82k £9.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.18k £655 £13.14k