SOLAR FOR SACH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have now completed our activities and have stopped all money raising and expenditure. The hospital now has solar powered electricity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Zambia
Governance
- 13 November 2018: Standard registration
- 13 September 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.62k | £2.16k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.06k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SOLAR PANELS TO HOSPITALS IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ZAMBIA, TO ENABLE ACCESS TO LOW COST OR FREE ELECTRICITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window