AYLESBURY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1179692
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN MICHAEL PIPER Trustee 24 April 2018 None on record
JENNET ANNE DIXON Trustee 24 April 2018 None on record
Jeremy Wealbund Holmes Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Jake Richard Crane Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
Anne Elizabeth Vujanic Trustee 24 April 2018 None on record
SIMON JOHN WEAVER Chair 09 May 2018
OPEN LEARNING Received: On time
Rev Peter Wheeler Trustee 17 October 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF AYLESBURY Received: On time