PROVIDING ANIMAL WELFARE SUPPORT (PAWS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Animal Welfare Support (PAWS) raises money to help small local animal rescues that have no other means of raising funds other than public support. We welcome these rescues to request funding when they face difficult times but also voluntarily donate on a monthly basis. We also help local pet owners that find themselves in financial crisis and are facing re homing a much loved pet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 April 2019: CIO registration
- PAWS LOCALLY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUSTIN WAYNE MOREMAN | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
julie parr | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor wilson | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.11k | £97.58k | £142.02k | £167.77k | £201.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.44k | £71.35k | £138.45k | £166.18k | £207.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.00k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN PARTICULAR; A) TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS B) TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO ANIMALS BELONGING TO PERSONS WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SERVICES OF A VETERINARY SURGEON
Contact information
- Address:
-
p.a.w.s. locally
142 Bawtry Road
Bramley
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S66 2TS
- Phone:
- 01709 730632
- Email:
- pawslocally@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window