COUNTRYMEN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Countrymen UK use the farm and countryside environments help to meet the challenges being faced by men who find themselves isolated because of deteriorating physical or mental health or changing social circumstances. Conditions may include: Dementia, Parkinsons, Stroke, Isolation, Injuries, Anxiety, Depression, Post Traumatic Stress, Chronic Pain, Cancer, Heart & Lung Conditions and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Ruth Woodcock | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Woodcock | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harry William Ridgewell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Spencer | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH LOCKYER | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Plumley | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND JONATHAN PATRICK HERBERT | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.51k | £21.98k | £35.49k | £56.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3 | £16.37k | £35.28k | £44.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
- TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF OLDER MEN IN THE UK WHO ARE LIVING WITH COGNITIVE AND MOBILITY ISSUES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE, RURAL CRAFTS, CARE FARMING, RESPITE SERVICES AND OTHER ECOTHERAPY TECHNIQUES. - TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG OLDER MEN IN THE UK WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY COMBATTING LONELINESS AND SOCIAL ISOLATION ARISING AS A RESULT OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, YOUTH OR OLD AGE; AND ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL)
Contact information
- Address:
-
RYLANDS
HOLNEST
SHERBORNE
DT9 5PS
- Phone:
- 01963210703
- Email:
- julie@futureroots.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window