TEIGN VALLEY MUSEUM AND ARCHIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain for the benefit of the public a History Centre relating to the Teign Valley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 11 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GRAHAM DAVID THOMPSON M.B.B.S. | Chair | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY JONATHAN CLARIDGE GRIFFIN B.A.,OXON | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY WILLIAM FRAZER COOK | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|||||
JAN ELIZABETH DEANE | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Kirkland | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £4.53k | £10.10k | £11.92k | £7.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £7.63k | £9.18k | £9.76k | £9.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO VIEW HISTORICAL DOCUMENTS AND OBJECTS RELATING TO THE TEIGN VALLEY 2)TO ENCOURAGE HISTORICAL RESEARCH AND PRESENTATION 3)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ORGANIZING EXHIBITIONS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL EVENTS AND DISPLAYS TO EXAMINE ASPECTS OF LOCAL HISTORY 4)TO ESTABLISH COLLECT AND MAINTAIN AN ARCHIVE OF DOCUMENTS AND ARTEFACTS CONCERNING THE HISTORY OF THE TEIGN VALLEY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESEARCH AND TO ENCOURAGE EDUCATION INTO LOCAL HISTORY 5)TO PROMOTE INTEREST AND ACTIVE RESEARCH INTO LOCAL HISTORY GENERALLY AND PARTICULARLY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION IN SUCH ACTIVITY BY THE SCHOOLS IN THE TEIGN VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROOMHILL COTTAGE
CHRISTOW
EXETER
EX6 7NP
- Phone:
- 01647253145
- Email:
- grahamt@tvhistorycentre.org
- Website:
-
tvhistorycentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window