HINDU TEMPLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 512062
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £138.30k £169.00k £149.88k £179.67k £166.98k
Total expenditure £61.58k £62.86k £92.76k £94.71k £85.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A