Accounts and annual returns ERITREAN COMMUNITY IN BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING
Charity number: 1179398

Charity reporting is overdue by 423 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 58 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 58 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 423 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 423 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 17 September 2020 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window