CCHS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CCHS UK provides support to people affected by CCHS throughout the UK. We hold family conferences and social days, network people affected by CCHS, advocate for people affected by CCHS, provide CCHS education and support CCHS research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 February 2019: Standard registration
- CCHS SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Maria Yardley | Chair | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Wagstaff | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gulliver | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.30k | £10.96k | £19.66k | £24.60k | £11.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.69k | £1.42k | £2.49k | £11.18k | £18.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 February 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH CCHS, THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ADVOCACY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CCHS UK
PO Box 713
STAINES-UPON-THAMES
Surrey
TW18 9JN
- Phone:
- 07771668159
- Email:
- AMANDA.YARDLEY@CCHS.UK
- Website:
-
CCHS.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window