Accounts and annual returns HOLY BIBLE GRACE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1177876
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 08 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window