Financial history CLWYD FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY (CYMDEITHAS HANES TEULUOEDD CLWYD)

Charity number: 512068
Charity reporting is overdue by 926 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £16.83k £18.71k £15.79k £28.15k £18.84k
Total expenditure £27.86k £26.33k £20.05k £18.19k £17.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.00k N/A