EGLWYSWRW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Eglwyswrw Community Hall, providing a meeting place for various bodies ( eg - Nursery School, W.I., Heritage Society etc).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,722
Total expenditure: £7,999

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET HELEN GRIFFITHS Chair
None on record
EILEEN THOMAS Trustee
None on record
MRS TRICIA FOX Trustee
None on record
MISS MANDY PHILLIPS Trustee
NO SHAME
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.76k £16.53k £11.24k £10.61k £8.72k
Total expenditure £2.63k £3.72k £2.62k £7.42k £8.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.50k £10.00k £3.96k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cross House
Eglwyswrw
CRYMYCH
SA41 3UJ
Phone:
01239891401
Website:

No information available