THE URBAN VOCAL GROUP

Charity number: 1178793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 17 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 12 March 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 12 March 2021 39 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 26 June 2019 On time Download