THE ROSALIND FRANKLIN INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rosalind Franklin Institute is a new national institute, funded by the UK government through UK Research and Innovation, dedicated to bringing about transformative changes in life science through interdisciplinary research and technology development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£20,508,464
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £20.38m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £125.06k |
Total expenditure:
£23,107,208
Raising funds | £118.36k | |
Charitable activities | £22.99m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £118.36k | |
Charitable expenditure | £22.99m |
People

128 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 2018: Standard registration
- RFI (Working name)
- ROSALIND FRANKLIN INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR VIVIENNE COX | Chair | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul McMahan Matthews | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Rees | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Jill Cooper | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mathias Gautel | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nigel Titchener-Hooker | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dauncey | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Barbara Maria Gigliola Ghinelli | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Burgess | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.72m | £28.13m | £15.58m | £16.76m | £20.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06m | £7.42m | £14.37m | £19.20m | £23.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.65m | £20.87m | £13.91m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £18.65m | £28.09m | £15.55m | £16.72m | £20.38m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £25.52k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £74.32k | £38.48k | £28.67k | £14.77k | £125.06k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.01m | £7.33m | £14.26m | £19.11m | £22.99m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £46.35k | £78.79k | £91.70k | £92.62k | £118.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £9.63k | £8.00k | £12.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.08k | £10.20k | £17.35k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.96m | £26.18m | £29.54m | £31.94m | £27.19m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £8.97m | £17.90m | £14.86m | £15.41m | £15.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £405.68k | £2.85m | £1.96m | £3.64m | £2.02m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE ROSALIND FRANKLIN INSTITUTE (THE "CHARITY") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION IN THE FIELDS OF THE PHYSICAL SCIENCES, ENGINEERING, HEALTH AND LIFE SCIENCES BY MEANS INCLUDING (A) CONDUCTING RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (B) COLLABORATING AND EXCHANGING KNOWLEDGE WITH UNIVERSITIES, INDUSTRY, CHARITIES AND OTHER NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS, THE STATE AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES; AND (C) PUBLIC ENGAGEMENT THROUGH EDUCATIONAL OUTREACH ACTIVITIES, IN EACH CASE WITH A VIEW TO ADVANCING THE STATE OF OUR COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH FIELDS OF STUDY; AND 2) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF HUMAN HEALTH, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION BY FURTHERING THE PROGRESS OF SCIENTIFIC DISCOVERIES AND NEW TECHNOLOGIES ARISING FROM RESEARCH INTO THERAPEUTIC TREATMENTS, DRUGS, DIAGNOSTICS, OTHER TECHNOLOGIES AND/OR INFORMATION RESOURCES BY CONDUCTING ITS OWN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES AND BY MEANS OF COLLABORATION WITH UNIVERSITIES, INDUSTRY, CHARITIES, THE STATE AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rosalind Franklin Institute
R113
RAL
Harwell Campus
Didcot
Oxfordsh
- Phone:
- 01235445000
- Email:
- info@rfi.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window