Accounts and annual returns BANO WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1178600
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 May 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 May 2024 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 May 2024 457 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 May 2024 457 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 May 2024 822 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 May 2024 822 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2024 1150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 April 2024 1179 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1626 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1626 days