THE BAMBURGH FOUR AND TWENTY

Charity number: 1179752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 May 2019 On time Download